TX SB1450 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of crafted precious metal dealers and dealerships; providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of crafted precious metal dealers and dealerships; providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-05-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Amended | |
2011-04-29 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-29 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
City Government
City Government--General
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
Consumer Protection
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
City Government
City Government--General
COINS & PRECIOUS METALS
Consumer Protection