TX SB1446 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to performance standards for certain aboveground storage tanks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to performance standards for certain aboveground storage tanks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Water & Rural Affairs
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-04SenateFiled
2019-03-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback