TX SB1446 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to contested cases conducted under the Administrative Procedure Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to contested cases conducted under the Administrative Procedure Act.


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1617 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments