TX SB1443 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenatePassed
2017-05-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback