TX SB1440 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the attendance by a quorum of a governmental body at certain candidate events under the open meetings law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the attendance by a quorum of a governmental body at certain candidate events under the open meetings law.


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]


2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Government Transparency & Operation
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-02SenateRecord vote
2017-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments