TX SB1424 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-20 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal procedure, including grand jury proceedings and the appointment of an attorney pro tem for certain criminal proceedings.
Title
Relating to criminal procedure, including grand jury proceedings and the appointment of an attorney pro tem for certain criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-05-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |