TX SB1423 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to validating certain acts of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District transferring real property rights.
Title
Relating to validating certain acts of the Lower Nueces River Water Supply District transferring real property rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - SB 1423Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
CORPUS CHRISTI, CITY OF
LOWER NUECES RIVER WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Validating Acts
City Government--General
CORPUS CHRISTI, CITY OF
LOWER NUECES RIVER WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Validating Acts