TX SB1421 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the correction of an ad valorem tax appraisal roll and to related appraisal records.
Title
Relating to the correction of an ad valorem tax appraisal roll and to related appraisal records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1419 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1369 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1419 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1369 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1419 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Amendment withdrawn 2-Shine |
2021-05-24 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2021-05-24 | House | Vote reconsidered |
2021-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#1369 |
2021-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 2-Shine |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended 1-Shine |
2021-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-08 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1628 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts