TX SB1421 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the awarding of grants provided by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
Title
Relating to the awarding of grants provided by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Open Government, Select | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed | |
2011-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |