TX SB141 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to debt management services and the regulation of debt management services providers.
Title
Relating to debt management services and the regulation of debt management services providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Read | |
2011-05-23 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-16 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-13 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-13 | Record vote | |
2011-05-13 | Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Failed to pass to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-15 | Record vote | |
2011-03-15 | Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-15 | Record vote | |
2011-03-15 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-15 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-01 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-02-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-02-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-02-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-02-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
DEBT
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
UNIFORM DEBT MANAGEMENT SERVICES ACT
DEBT
Financial
Financial--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
UNIFORM DEBT MANAGEMENT SERVICES ACT