TX SB1404 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring school districts and open-enrollment charter schools to report certain information regarding expanded learning opportunities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring school districts and open-enrollment charter schools to report certain information regarding expanded learning opportunities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1619 (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - RV#1574 (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-28SenateRead
2017-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenatePassed
2017-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-03SenateRecord vote
2017-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-07SenateFiled
2017-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1404
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01404I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01404S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01404E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01404H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01404F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1404&RcdVtNo=1574&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1404&RcdVtNo=1619&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=91

Bill Comments

feedback