TX SB1401 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain providers of laboratory services to participate in programs administered by health and human services agencies or the Health and Human Services Commission.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain providers of laboratory services to participate in programs administered by health and human services agencies or the Health and Human Services Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - SB 1401Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed |
2013-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |