TX SB1376 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a joint interim study regarding the state's response to modifications to federal health care laws.
Title
Relating to a joint interim study regarding the state's response to modifications to federal health care laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |