TX SB1361 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the powers and duties of the Sabine-Neches Navigation District of Jefferson County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the powers and duties of the Sabine-Neches Navigation District of Jefferson County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective immediately
2017-06-01 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenatePassed
2017-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-12SenateRecord vote
2017-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-11SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-03-16SenateRead first time
2017-03-07SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback