TX SB1347 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties, authority to issue bonds, and authority to impose a tax of the SH130 Municipal Management District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties, authority to issue bonds, and authority to impose a tax of the SH130 Municipal Management District No. 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3135 (Same As) 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
SH130 MUNICIPAL MANAGEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
TRAVIS COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
TRAVIS COUNTY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1347 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01347I.htm |