TX SB1340 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to voter qualification and registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to voter qualification and registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-20HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-20HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-14SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13SenateAmended
2021-04-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
2021-04-13SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1340
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01340I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01340S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01340E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01340S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01340I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01340I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01340S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01340S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01340E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=8

Bill Comments 750

feedback