TX SB1336 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 79-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a limit on the rate of growth of certain appropriations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a limit on the rate of growth of certain appropriations.

Sponsors

Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]Sen. Robert Nichols [R]
Sen. Angela Paxton [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]
Sen. Drew Springer [R]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Dennis Paul [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Mike Schofield [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]
Rep. David Cook [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Jake Ellzey [R]Rep. James Frank [R]
Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Gary Gates [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Ken King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Morgan Meyer [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]
Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]Rep. Chris Paddie [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Glenn Rogers [R]
Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Bryan Slaton [R]
Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. David Spiller [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]
Rep. Cody Vasut [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Terry Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1502 (Y: 89 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1502
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-16HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-16HouseRead first time
2021-04-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-13SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenatePassed
2021-04-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenateAmended
2021-04-12SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
2021-04-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29SenateMeeting cancelled
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3548 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Appropriations

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1336
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01336I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01336S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01336E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01336H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01336F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01336S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01336I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01336I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01336E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01336H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01336F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1336&RcdVtNo=1502&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback