TX SB1329 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation and administration of and practice in courts in the judicial branch of state government; increasing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation and administration of and practice in courts in the judicial branch of state government; increasing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-27 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1955 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1368 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-27HouseRecord vote
2017-05-27HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-26SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-18HouseAmended
2017-05-18HouseAmended
2017-05-18HouseAmended
2017-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-13HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-04-13HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-06SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-06SenateRecord vote
2017-04-06SenatePassed
2017-04-06SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-06SenateRecord vote
2017-04-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-06SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-14SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateFiled
2017-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1329
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01329I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01329S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01329E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01329H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01329F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-06-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1329&RcdVtNo=1368&Ch=H&Dt=05/19/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1329&RcdVtNo=1955&Ch=H&Dt=05/27/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=41

Bill Comments

feedback