TX SB1328 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to optional dispute resolution methods regarding educational services for students with a disability, including individualized education program facilitation.
Title
Relating to optional dispute resolution methods regarding educational services for students with a disability, including individualized education program facilitation.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-04 | Read first time | |
2011-05-03 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Amended | |
2011-05-03 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-29 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Education | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Filed | |
2011-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--School Districts
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--School Districts
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION