TX SB1322 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a temporary local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a disaster.
Title
Relating to a temporary local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of a portion of the appraised value of certain property damaged by a disaster.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR49 (Enabling for) 2019-04-03 - Co-author authorized
HB492 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
HB492 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Property-State Administration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1322 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01322I.htm |