TX SB132 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the savings incentive program for state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the savings incentive program for state agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1732 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-03-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenatePassed
2017-03-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-20SenateRecord vote
2017-03-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-14SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Finance
2017-01-25SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB132
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00132I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00132S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00132E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00132H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00132F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-20-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB132&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB132&RcdVtNo=1732&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017

Bill Comments

feedback