TX SB1313 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to demonstration programs for childhood obesity and chronic disease prevention in certain border counties.
Title
Relating to demonstration programs for childhood obesity and chronic disease prevention in certain border counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Rep. Robert Guerra [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BORDER
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF