TX SB13 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#64 (Y: 96 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - House - Amended RV#59 (Y: 91 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-08-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 2, 2021
2021-09-10 Signed by the Governor
2021-08-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-08-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-08-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-08-30HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-08-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-08-29SenateRecord vote
2021-08-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-08-29SenateRead
2021-08-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-08-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-08-27HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-27HouseRecord vote RV#64
2021-08-27HousePassed
2021-08-27HouseRead 3rd time
2021-08-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-08-26HouseRecord vote RV#59
2021-08-26HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-08-26HouseAmended 1-Hunter
2021-08-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-08-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-08-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-08-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-08-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-08-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-08-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-08-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-08-20HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2021-08-19HouseReferred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
2021-08-19HouseRead first time
2021-08-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-08-10SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenatePassed
2021-08-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-08-09SenateRecord vote
2021-08-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-08-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-08-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-08-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-08-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-08-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-08-07SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-08-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-08-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-08-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-08-07SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-08-07SenateRecord vote
2021-08-07SenateRules suspended
2021-08-07SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-08-07SenateRead first time
2021-08-07SenateFiled
2021-08-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB15 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
HB15 (Similar To) 2021-08-23 - Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB13
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00013I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00013S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00013E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00013H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/billtext/html/SB00013F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/amendments/html/SB00013H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00013I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00013I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00013E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00013H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/fiscalnotes/html/SB00013F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/872/analysis/html/SB00013F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-07-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-09-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB13&RcdVtNo=59&Ch=H&Dt=08/26/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=872&Bill=SB13&RcdVtNo=64&Ch=H&Dt=08/27/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/872/pdf/87S208-29-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback