TX SB1298 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the selection and summons of prospective grand jurors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the selection and summons of prospective grand jurors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1298 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-15HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-13SenateRead first time
2017-03-03SenateFiled
2017-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1298
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01298I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01298S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01298E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01298H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01298F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-26-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1298&RcdVtNo=1804&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1298&RcdVtNo=1814&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=48

Bill Comments

feedback