TX SB1296 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the approval of a certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain transmission projects.
Title
Relating to the approval of a certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain transmission projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2848 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2848 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2848 (Same As) 2023-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars