TX SB1278 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the authority of a judge to suspend the imposition of a sentence and place a defendant on community supervision.
Title
Relating to the authority of a judge to suspend the imposition of a sentence and place a defendant on community supervision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-01 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-31 | Record vote | |
2009-03-31 | Passed | |
2009-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-31 | Record vote | |
2009-03-31 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-31 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-31 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-31 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-03-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed | |
2009-03-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2258 (Same As) 2009-03-09 - Referred to Corrections
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION