TX SB1270 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the procurement of certain goods and services related to highways by the Texas Department of Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the procurement of certain goods and services related to highways by the Texas Department of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1383 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective immediately
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1383
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3515 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1270
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01270I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01270S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01270E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01270H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01270F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01270I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01270I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01270S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01270S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01270E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01270H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01270F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1270&RcdVtNo=1383&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments

feedback