TX SB1267 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to continuing education and training requirements for educators and other school district personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to continuing education and training requirements for educators and other school district personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1746 (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Amended RV#1492 (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1746
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-28HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-28SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-28SenateRead
2021-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1492
2021-05-25HousePassed as amended
2021-05-25HouseAmended 2-M. González
2021-05-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-25HousePostponed 5/25/21 6:15 PM
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-M. González, Larson, Parker, and Price
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24HouseAmended 2-Lozano
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-Lozano
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 West
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3804 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1267
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01267I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01267S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01267E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01267H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01267F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01267S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01267H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01267H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01267H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01267H32.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01267I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01267I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01267S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01267S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01267H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01267H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01267F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01267F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-21-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1267&RcdVtNo=1492&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1267&RcdVtNo=1746&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-21-F.PDF#page=13

Bill Comments

feedback