TX SB1253 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the electronic recording and admissibility of certain custodial interrogations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the electronic recording and admissibility of certain custodial interrogations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1563 (Y: 115 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1508 (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Passed (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Passed to engrossment as amended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenatePassed
2017-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-24SenateRecord vote
2017-04-24SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24SenateAmended
2017-04-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-13SenateRead first time
2017-03-03SenateFiled
2017-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback