TX SB1245 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the farm and ranch survey conducted by the comptroller for purposes of estimating the productivity value of qualified open-space land as part of the study of school district taxable values.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the farm and ranch survey conducted by the comptroller for purposes of estimating the productivity value of qualified open-space land as part of the study of school district taxable values.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1285 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1285
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenatePassed
2021-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-09SenateFiled
2021-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1245
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01245I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01245S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01245E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01245H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01245F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01245I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01245I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01245S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01245S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01245E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01245H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01245F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-20-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1245&RcdVtNo=1285&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback