TX SB1239 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a municipality to remove directors of the North Texas Municipal Water District.
Title
Relating to the authority of a municipality to remove directors of the North Texas Municipal Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
NORTH TEXAS MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
City Government--General
NORTH TEXAS MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility