TX SB1239 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
Summary
Relating to discount programs for certain veterans provided by toll project entities.
Title
Relating to discount programs for certain veterans provided by toll project entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-02 | Filed | |
2009-03-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3139 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
HB3620 (Similar To) 2009-03-19 - Referred to Transportation
HB3620 (Similar To) 2009-03-19 - Referred to Transportation