TX SB1232 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to inappropriate conduct between a person and an animal; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to inappropriate conduct between a person and an animal; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1480 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-20 - House - Amended RV#1440 (Y: 122 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-21HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-20HouseRecord vote
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-20HouseAmended
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenatePassed
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-03-13SenateRead first time
2017-03-02SenateFiled
2017-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1232
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01232I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01232S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01232E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01232H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01232F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1232&RcdVtNo=1440&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1232&RcdVtNo=1480&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=175

Bill Comments

feedback