TX SB1219 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to human trafficking signs at certain transportation hubs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to human trafficking signs at certain transportation hubs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateFiled
2019-02-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback