TX SB1214 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-24 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to equal opportunity for access by private and parochial school students to certain University Interscholastic League sponsored activities.
Title
Relating to equal opportunity for access by private and parochial school students to certain University Interscholastic League sponsored activities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Garza [R] | Sen. Steve Ogden [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-06 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-06 | Record vote | |
2011-05-06 | Amended | |
2011-05-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-06 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-06 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-06 | Postponed | |
2011-05-06 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-11 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-16 | Referred to Education | |
2011-03-16 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed | |
2011-03-07 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE