TX SB12 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-17)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a grant program to assist law enforcement agencies with the purchase of bulletproof vests and body armor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a grant program to assist law enforcement agencies with the purchase of bulletproof vests and body armor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1293 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1275 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27 Effective immediately
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-16HouseRecord vote
2017-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-10HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-04-10HouseRead first time
2017-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenatePassed
2017-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-13SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-13SenateAmended
2017-03-13SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-13SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-01SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-31SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-12SenateFiled
2017-01-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB12
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00012I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00012S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00012E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00012H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00012F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-13-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-13-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB12&RcdVtNo=1275&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB12&RcdVtNo=1293&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2017

Bill Comments

feedback