TX SB1198 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the conversion of the Hays Caldwell Public Utility Agency to the Alliance Regional Water Authority; providing authority to issue bonds; granting the power of eminent domain; providing authority to impose fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the conversion of the Hays Caldwell Public Utility Agency to the Alliance Regional Water Authority; providing authority to issue bonds; granting the power of eminent domain; providing authority to impose fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - SB 1198 Third Reading House (Y: 112 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Filed without the Governor's signature
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-27SenateRecord vote
2017-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-16HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-12HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-01HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateAmended
2017-04-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-03-02SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2017-03-02SenateFiled
2017-03-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1198
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01198I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01198S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01198E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01198H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01198F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-18-F.PDF#page=32
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1198&RcdVtNo=1804&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1198&RcdVtNo=1814&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=32

Bill Comments

feedback