TX SB1189 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain deceptive advertising of legal services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain deceptive advertising of legal services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1423 (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1423
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-15HouseAmended 1-Y. Davis, J.E. Johnson, and Neave
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-15HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-26SenateFiled
2019-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2251 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1189
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01189I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01189S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01189E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01189H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01189F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-11-F1.PDF#page=30
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-11-F1.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-11-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1189&RcdVtNo=1423&Ch=H&Dt=05/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=28

Bill Comments

feedback