TX SB1169 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to abolishing the Private Sector Prison Industries Oversight Authority and to the certification and operation of private sector prison industries programs.
Title
Relating to abolishing the Private Sector Prison Industries Oversight Authority and to the certification and operation of private sector prison industries programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-26 | Filed | |
2009-02-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1914 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
PRIVATE SECTOR PRISON INDUSTRIES OVERSIGHT AUTHORITY
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
PRIVATE SECTOR PRISON INDUSTRIES OVERSIGHT AUTHORITY
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions