TX SB116 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protective orders against dating violence.
Title
Relating to protective orders against dating violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Read | |
2011-05-23 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-20 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-19 | Amended | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Recommitted to Local & Consent Calendars Comm | |
2011-05-03 | Called from the table | |
2011-04-14 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-14 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-12 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-11 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-29 | Read first time | |
2011-03-22 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-21 | Record vote | |
2011-03-21 | Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-21 | Record vote | |
2011-03-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-17 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed | |
2010-11-08 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |