TX SB1153 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to parental rights and information regarding certain intervention strategies used with public school students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to parental rights and information regarding certain intervention strategies used with public school students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1367 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26SenateRecord vote
2017-05-26SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-19HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HousePassed
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-18HouseAmended
2017-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-18HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenatePassed
2017-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-26SenateRecord vote
2017-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-09SenateRead first time
2017-02-28SenateFiled
2017-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback