TX SB1148 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to maintenance of certification by a physician or an applicant for a license to practice medicine in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to maintenance of certification by a physician or an applicant for a license to practice medicine in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#2006 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1738 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Amended RV#1693 (Y: 135 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Motion to table fails RV#1692 (Y: 63 N: 82 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 1/1/18
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-26SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-26HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-26HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseMotion to table fails
2017-05-23HouseAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-23HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-23HousePostponed
2017-05-23HousePoint of order withdrawn
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-06HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenatePassed
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenateRecord vote
2017-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27SenateAmended
2017-04-27SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-07SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-07SenateRead first time
2017-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-28SenateFiled
2017-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1148
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01148I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01148S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01148E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01148H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01148F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1148&RcdVtNo=1692&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1148&RcdVtNo=1693&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1148&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1148&RcdVtNo=1738&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1148&RcdVtNo=2006&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=64

Bill Comments

feedback