TX SB1138 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study on streamlining public safety net programs to reduce costs and improve outcomes for recipients under the programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study on streamlining public safety net programs to reduce costs and improve outcomes for recipients under the programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1725 (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1019 (Y: 89 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Amended RV#1006 (Y: 83 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1005 (Y: 70 N: 77 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-29HouseRecord vote RV#1725
2021-05-29HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-28HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-28SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1019
2021-05-13HousePassed
2021-05-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#1006
2021-05-12HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-12HouseAmended 3-Romero
2021-05-12HouseRecord vote RV#1005
2021-05-12HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-A. Johnson
2021-05-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-12HousePostponed 5/12/21 7:45 PM
2021-05-12HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-12HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-A. Johnson
2021-05-12HouseLaid out as postponed business
2021-05-12HousePostponed 5/12/21 6:30 PM
2021-05-12HouseAmended 1-Goodwin
2021-05-12HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 12, Section 1(b)
2021-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-12HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 1886
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenatePassed
2021-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-08SenateFiled
2021-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1886 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1886 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1138
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01138I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01138S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01138E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01138H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01138F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01138H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01138H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01138H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01138I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01138I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01138S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01138S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01138E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01138H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01138F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01138F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1005&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1006&Ch=H&Dt=05/12/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1019&Ch=H&Dt=05/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-27-F.PDF#page=31
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1725&Ch=H&Dt=05/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments

feedback