TX SB1138 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-24)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the creation of the blue alert system to aid in the apprehension of an individual suspected of killing or causing serious bodily injury to a law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the creation of the blue alert system to aid in the apprehension of an individual suspected of killing or causing serious bodily injury to a law enforcement officer.


Sen. John Whitmire [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Brian Birdwell [R]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]
Sen. Konni Burton [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]Sen. Craig Estes [R]
Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Kelly Hancock [R]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]
Sen. Donald Huffines [R]Sen. Joan Huffman [R]Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Borris Miles [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]
Sen. Robert Nichols [R]Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]
Sen. Kel Seliger [R]Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R]Sen. Carlos Uresti [D]
Sen. Kirk Watson [D]Sen. Royce West [D]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. Matt Krause [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. Cesar Blanco [D]
Rep. Alma Allen [D]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R]Rep. Cindy Burkett [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Philip Cortez [D]
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]Rep. Jessica Farrar [D]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Cole Hefner [R]
Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Phil King [R]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. Armando Martinez [D]
Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]
Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. Hugh Shine [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]
Rep. Tomas Uresti [D]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. John Zerwas [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1733 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1685 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]


2017-06-01 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-19HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2017-04-19HouseRead first time
2017-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-13SenateRecord vote
2017-03-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-28SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-28SenateRead first time
2017-02-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-13-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1685&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1138&RcdVtNo=1733&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017

Bill Comments