TX SB1136 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to imposing a fee on the sale of cigarettes and cigarette tobacco products manufactured by certain companies; providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to imposing a fee on the sale of cigarettes and cigarette tobacco products manufactured by certain companies; providing penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-29SenateReported from s/c favorably with substitute
2013-04-29SenateConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2013-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2013-04-25SenateLeft pending in subcommittee
2013-04-25SenateTestimony taken in subcommittee
2013-04-25SenateConsidered by s/c in public hearing
2013-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
2013-03-18SenateReferred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Finance
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-03-05SenateFiled
2013-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback