TX SB1113 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to matching private grants given to enhance additional research activities at institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to matching private grants given to enhance additional research activities at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |