TX SB11 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-02 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-02 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to making supplemental appropriations and giving direction regarding appropriations.
Title
Relating to making supplemental appropriations and giving direction regarding appropriations.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Beverly Powell [D] |
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-07 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-02 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-08-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Filed |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB5 (Same As) 2021-09-17 - Effective immediately
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SENATE, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Taxation
Taxation--School District
UNIFORM STATE LAWS, COMMISSION ON
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
SENATE, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Taxation
Taxation--School District
UNIFORM STATE LAWS, COMMISSION ON