TX SB11 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Point of order withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Point of order withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the drug testing of certain persons seeking financial assistance benefits.
Title
Relating to the drug testing of certain persons seeking financial assistance benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2013-05-21 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-21 | House | Amended |
2013-05-21 | House | Amended |
2013-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-05-21 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-05-21 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-21 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DRUG & ALCOHOL TESTING
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Labor
Labor--General
TEMPORARY ASSISTANCE FOR NEEDY FAMILIES
WELFARE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Direct Assistance
Labor
Labor--General
TEMPORARY ASSISTANCE FOR NEEDY FAMILIES
WELFARE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS