TX SB1092 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disclosure of certain information regarding course materials by public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the disclosure of certain information regarding course materials by public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2021-05-21 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2021-05-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-07 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1027 (Similar To) 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Textbooks
Electronic Information Systems
ELECTRONIC TEXTBOOKS
INTERNET
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Textbooks
Electronic Information Systems
ELECTRONIC TEXTBOOKS
INTERNET