TX SB1088 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Summary
Relating to the use of food stamp benefits at farmers markets.
Title
Relating to the use of food stamp benefits at farmers markets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-15 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-06 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Passed | |
2009-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-06 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-06 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-24 | Filed | |
2009-02-24 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |